U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00270
  • Case Name: Cooley v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 12, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: [Extend Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.