U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00509
  • Case Name: Etheridge v. Neshoba County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 22, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.