U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00375
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Perry et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
January, 2025
  • January 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.