U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00326
  • Case Name: McDonald v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 11, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 26, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 14, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.