U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00085
  • Case Name: A & T Express, LLC v. Town of Prentiss
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 24, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.