U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-03148
  • Case Name: Trim v. Madison HMA, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • April 18, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • April 17, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 09, 2025: [In Limine]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
November, 2024
  • November 06, 2024: [Subpoena Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.