U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 03, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 25, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Suppress]
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.