U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00658
  • Case Name: Knighton v. Pilot Travel Centers LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Compel]
November, 2024
  • November 11, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.