U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Reddell v. Rankin County, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2024
  • November 11, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.