U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00725
  • Case Name: Reed v. Ray et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 15, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Attachment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 07, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Omnibus Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.