U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-03113
  • Case Name: Pauliah v. University of Mississippi Medical Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 08, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • May 07, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Telephonic Discovery Conference]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.