U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Life Insurance Company of North America v. McDaniel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
December, 2024
  • December 03, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.