U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Young v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings]
  • May 14, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Case Stay Lifted]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Objection to Notice of Deposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.