U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Dynasty Energy Services, LLC v. Liberty Operating Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Attachment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 24, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 24, 2025: [Attachment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.