U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00816
  • Case Name: Bosarge v. Mississippi Department of Public Safety et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 04, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
December, 2024
  • December 19, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.