U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Industrial & Crane Services, Inc. v. Sarens U.S.A, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Attachment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Telephonic Discovery Conference]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Joinder in Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.