U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00792
  • Case Name: Mississippi Bankers Association et al v. Consumer Financial Protection Bureau et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 15, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Rebuttal]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae]
  • January 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.