U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00755
  • Case Name: Mason v. City of Magee et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 02, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.