U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00497
  • Case Name: Harris v. King et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Change of Address]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.