U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00248
  • Case Name: Bluu Safari, LLC v. Set Sail Wind Jammer Cruises, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 28, 2025: [Attachment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2025
  • February 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.