U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Young v. Howard Industries, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 06, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.