U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00371
  • Case Name: Lomax v. Arnold et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.