U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00674
  • Case Name: Germany et al v. Rankin County Sheriff's Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2025
  • February 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to Serve Process]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.