U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seals, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 13, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [In Limine]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2025
  • February 16, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.