U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Gilmer v. Tucker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Joinder in Document]
  • May 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2025: [Stay Case]
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to Serve Process]
  • May 01, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 26, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 26, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to Serve Process]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Issued]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.