U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Armstrong et al v. City of Long Beach, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 12, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.