U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Steel Service Corporation et al v. Cadrecha et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 13, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 12, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 08, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 07, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 02, 2025: [Rebuttal]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice fee paid(credit card)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 16, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • April 09, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Remand]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Remand]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.