U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Nealy v. CR Transport, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amended Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 10, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.