U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00382
  • Case Name: Washington v. Avanos Medical Sales, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • March 13, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.