U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00788
  • Case Name: Doe v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Restricted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.