U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mellinger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 12, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.