U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00500
  • Case Name: Russell v. City of Lexington et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.