U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Roberts et al v. Transco Lines, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.