U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00023
  • Case Name: AFNB Home Care, LLC v. Burks et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 03, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Exhibit (Sealed) (Document)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.