U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00430
  • Case Name: Gomez v. Yazoo City USP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Habeas Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 21, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.