U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-03074
  • Case Name: Brown et al v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal or Restrict Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 17, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 17, 2025: [Seal or Restrict]
  • March 17, 2025: [Seal or Restrict Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.