U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Clay v. Weyo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Telephonic Discovery Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.