U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Umul-Umul
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 11, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.