U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Walker v. Mid South Waffles, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 08, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.