U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Smith v. Wal-Mart Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 12, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.