U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00670
  • Case Name: Leggett et al v. City of Ridgeland, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.