U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00358
  • Case Name: Parker v. B.W. Boatworks, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 16, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sanctions]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 09, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 10, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.