U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Emmerich Newspapers, Inc. et al v. Mississippi River Commission
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 10, 2025: [Case Management Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.