U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00172
  • Case Name: Berglind v. Subbarao, D.O. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Telephonic Discovery Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.