U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Ussery v. Walmart Stores East, LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 12, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.