U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Barham v. Beckum et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 26, 2025: [Attachment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Stay Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Permanent Injunction]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss Case as Frivolous]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • March 10, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.