U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00288
  • Case Name: Ducre v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • May 14, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.