U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Fountain v. Sheqa Transportation, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.