U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Cornette v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set Aside Default]
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 15, 2025: [Entry of Default]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.