U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Sterling et al v. Liberty Mutual Group Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
April, 2025
  • April 05, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.